SUDHIR KUMAR CHATURVEDI
-
About SUDHIR KUMAR CHATURVEDI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2007PTC119531 PIYUSH COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 428900.0 Active 15/10/2015 - U51909WB2011PLC165674 PINKROSE DEALCOMM LIMITED 10540000.0 Active 10/10/2015 - U51909WB2011PLC165676 SUNGOLD SHOPPERS LIMITED 10580000.0 Active 10/10/2015 - U51909WB2011PLC165683 MANGALSHREE SALES LIMITED 10560000.0 Active 27/02/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC165865 PANCHGANGA TIEUP PRIVATE LIMITED 610000.0 Active 17/10/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
KOVID MUKHERJEE Director MAHADEB GHOSH Director PAWAN KUMAR ANCHALIA Director OMPRAKASH MISHRA Director