SANDEEP KUMAR AGRAWAL
-
About SANDEEP KUMAR AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201WB1997PTC082914 ATHENA HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 2856000.0 Active 25/04/2011 - U45400WB2007PTC116205 LIMELIGHT ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 5362000.0 Active 30/07/2007 - U45400WB2011PTC170209 PROSPERITY NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 1100000.0 Active 01/12/2011 - U51109WB2006PTC108702 PROSPERITY TRADE LINK PVT LTD 2520000.0 Active 20/04/2006 - U70109WB1999PTC089875 SHRIYA PERFECTION PRIVATE LIMITED 182000.0 Active 05/07/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SUSHIL KUMAR KHOWALA Director INDER RAJ AGRAWAL Director JYOTI AGARWAL Director