SACHIN KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SACHIN KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14200AS2010PTC009783 SONAPAHAR NATURAL RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2010 - U27100WB2009PLC137300 SWARNREKHA STEEL INDUSTRIES LIMITED 700000.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U27107WB2003PLC096807 GANGA POWER & NATURAL RESOURCES LIMITED 510000.0 Active 19/08/2003 - U27109OR1991PLC002859 VEDVYAS ISPAT LIMITED 56000000.0 Amalgamated 15/08/2007 - U40101WB2005PLC102934 NEEPAZ POWER LIMITED 700000.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U52392WB2003PLC095975 ADHUNIK INFOTECH LIMITED 18018100.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U70101WB2005PLC105172 ADHUNIK SHRISTI & POWER TRADING COMPANY LIMITED 600000.0 Active 01/01/2010 -