SANDEEP KUMAR BHAGAT
-
About SANDEEP KUMAR BHAGAT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100AS2009PTC008915 SHREE SAI JYOTI IRON & STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 16/01/2009 - U27101AR2003PLC007016 SMS SMELTERS LIMITED 153499990.0 Active 10/04/2003 - U27101ML2001PLC006538 SHREE SAI SMELTERS INDIA LIMITED 44706000.0 Active 01/06/2001 - U27101ML2001PLC006539 SHREE SAI ROLLING MILLS INDIA LIMITED 44253000.0 Active 01/06/2001 - U27101ML2002PTC006866 MEGHALAYA ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 10020000.0 Active 22/03/2010 - U27107ML1996PLC004784 SHREE SAI MEGHA ALLOYS LTD 70887500.0 Active 21/06/1996 - U27107ML1999PTC005726 SHREE SAI PRAKASH ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 48335000.0 Active 06/04/1999 - U45203AS2005PTC007644 EDEN RIVERSCAPE PRIVATE LIMITED 2111800.0 Active 31/01/2005 - U74899WB1995PLC130823 NISHU LEASING AND FINANCE LIMITED 27885550.0 Active 11/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors