SANJAY AGRAWAL
-
About SANJAY AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403CT2013PTC000829 MAHANADI KRISHI UPAJ PRIVATE LIMITED 1687290.0 Active 01/10/2015 - U04010WB2005PLC132889 HIND ENERGY AND COAL BENEFICATION (INDIA) LIMITED 54948130.0 Active 25/04/2005 - U04520CT2004PTC016993 RAMA REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 12422500.0 Active 28/09/2004 - U05110WB2006PTC132969 HIND MULTI SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 6636380.0 Active 29/03/2006 - U14299CT2003PTC001360 CLEAN COAL ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 196800000.0 Active 14/12/2015 - U45201CT2008PTC020675 RSR REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3705490.0 Active 23/05/2008 - U51109WB2005PTC106929 ZODIAC DEALERS PVT LTD 29462000.0 Active 01/09/2009 - U51109WB2007PTC117372 RAMA COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 15100000.0 Active 20/07/2007 - U51909WB1995PTC070439 ATMA COMMERCE PVT. LTD. 25144500.0 Active 11/02/2009 - U51909WB2008PTC123191 PANTHER VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 01/04/2008 - U70100CT2008PTC020676 BHARTI INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 3477540.0 Active 23/05/2008 - U70200WB2007PTC117373 FORTUNE RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 47233790.0 Active 20/07/2007 - U74140CT2010PTC022002 BHARTI MANPOWER SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 49500000.0 Active 18/08/2010 - U80302CT2009PTC021444 CG INSTITUTE OF EDUCATION PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 30/10/2009 - U85191CT2012NPL000502 HIND FOUNDATION 40000.0 Active 03/09/2012 - -
Associated with Directors