SHILPA ARORA
-
About SHILPA ARORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15129HR2016PTC064094 LEAN MUNCH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/05/2016 - U31909DL2000PTC105823 SAFECON INDIA TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U51909DL2009PTC189487 SAFETECH TRADEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/04/2009 - U74140DL2012PTC242586 SAFETECH TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/09/2012 - U74900DL2009PTC189472 KRISHIV CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/04/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
DANIELA ANDREA SHARMA Director ADITYA ARORA Director