SUSHIL GOENKA
-
About SUSHIL GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01122TG1993PTC090035 SIMHAPURI AGRO PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 7502000.0 Active 29/03/2012 - U15400TG2010PTC069556 3F OIL PALM AGROTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100100000.0 Active 16/01/2012 - U15400TG2011PTC077400 KOTTU OIL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2014 - U15411TG2014PTC092617 3F FUJI FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000000.0 Active 30/01/2014 - U24120AP1960PLC000888 3F INDUSTRIES LIMITED 104566480.0 Active 01/04/2008 - U52520AP1999PLC031721 ASIA PACIFIC COMMODITIES LIMITED 30000000.0 Amalgamated 18/05/1999 - U85100TG2012NPL080040 HYDERABAD BICYCLING CLUB 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U91110MH1971NPL015233 THE SOLVENT EXTRACTORS ASSOCIATION OF INDIA 0.0 Active 22/09/2006 - -
Associated with Directors