SATYA BRATA DEY
-
About SATYA BRATA DEY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L67190WB1991PLC050656 SREELEATHERS LIMITED 251550120.0 Active 02/12/1999 - U19113WB2007PTC120662 TUG OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 633540.0 Active 28/11/2007 - U19129WB1989PTC046836 SUMANTA SUSANTA EXPORTS PVT LTD. 329000.0 Active 05/05/1989 - U19129WB1994PTC062800 SREE LEATHERS PVT LTD 6371000.0 Amalgamated 31/03/1994 - U19201WB1994PLC063912 SREELEATHERS OVERSEAS LTD. 504000.0 Active 12/07/1994 - U33203WB1943PTC011344 STEPHENS & CO PVT LTD 400000.0 Active 03/08/2010 - U45400WB2008PTC130472 TUG DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 398060.0 Active 11/11/2008 - U51109WB1997PTC082738 UPKAR VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 10340000.0 Active 01/08/2005 - U51109WB2009PTC135950 MANGLAM TRADEWINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 176000.0 Converted to LLP 29/02/2016 - U51909WB1996PTC079863 SUMANTA SUSANTA OVERSEAS PVT LTD 7388250.0 Active 27/08/2004 - U65910WB1996PTC124385 TUG INDOFIN PRIVATE LIMITED 15601000.0 Active 10/05/2012 - U65921WB1981PTC140644 MOHAN HIRE PURCHASE PRIVATE LIMITED 25185000.0 Active 13/05/2014 - U65993WB1996PTC078805 DEYS FINANCE PVT LTD 6220200.0 Amalgamated 29/03/1996 - U74300WB1992PTC055036 EASEL ADVERTISING PVT LTD 968500.0 Active 31/03/1992 - U91110WB1940NPL010249 BENGAL NATIONAL CHAMBER OF COMMERCE & INDUSTRY 0.0 Active 26/09/2015 - -
Associated with Directors