SHYAM SUNDER AGARWAL
-
About SHYAM SUNDER AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15314WB1988PTC043788 JALPAI ROLLER FLOUR MILLS PVT LTD 1790000.0 Active 08/10/2015 - U45209WB1991PTC052028 MAONIL ESTATES PVT LTD 2535000.0 Active 17/03/2004 - U51909WB2008PTC124445 SRSG INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1046250.0 Active 25/03/2008 - U70101WB2000PTC091205 ABHINAV NIKETAN PRIVATE LIMITED 103000.0 Active 24/02/2000 -