SUSHIL KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SUSHIL KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB1992PTC057022 TEPCON MERCANTILES PVT LTD 113000.0 Active 13/09/2005 - U51909WB2010PTC148749 MOONDHARA AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 20/05/2010 - U51909WB2012PLC184918 MANGALSUDHA BARTER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 22/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184919 MANGALSUDHA COMMERCIAL LIMITED 500000.0 Active 22/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184928 NIRMALKUNJ TRADECOM LIMITED 500000.0 Active 22/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184971 OVERGROW TIE UP LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184985 NIRMALKUNJ AGENCY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184986 NITYADHARA BARTER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184987 NITYADHARA TRADERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PLC184990 OVERGROW BARTER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
GOPAL SAHAROY RANJAN Director SITA RAM AGARWAL Director SUNIL KUMAR SINHA Director