SANJAY AGARWAL
-
About SANJAY AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10102AR2008PLC008257 CONCAST CEMENT INDUSTRIES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 14/02/2011 - U14107AR1999PTC005827 NAMCHIK MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 509000.0 Active 22/09/1999 - U27101AR2003PLC007016 SMS SMELTERS LIMITED 153499990.0 Active 08/08/2013 - U27101AR2006PTC008113 PLATINUM ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 122455200.0 Active 08/08/2013 - U27310AR2013PTC008398 SHREE SALASAR INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 180850000.0 Active 10/07/2014 - U40105AR2008PLC008256 SATYAM (NORTH EAST) THERMAL POWER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 14/02/2011 - U51109AS2008PTC011851 SONATA COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 6560000.0 Active 01/04/2016 - U51909AS2005PTC007751 SADHANA TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 16130000.0 Active 05/04/2016 - U51909AS2010PTC011861 WELKIN VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2016 - U63040AS2005PTC007752 HARMONY TOURISM PRIVATE LIMITED 3700000.0 Active 11/04/2016 - -
Associated with Directors