SAROJ AGARWAL
-
About SAROJ AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45202UP1989PLC010606 T A TRANSFORMERS LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/02/1996 - U45400UP2012PTC049078 GANPATI INFRAESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/02/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC049132 SADGURU KRIPA TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 29/02/2012 - U65910UP2002PTC026637 AGARWAL FIN-LEASE AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1100200.0 Active 03/05/2002 - U65993UP1992PTC014587 VIBHU ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 1475200.0 Active 01/02/2016 - U65993UP1992PTC014631 CHINHAT LAND AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 1515200.0 Active 10/08/1992 - U74899DL1990PLC041401 TECHNICAL ASSOCIATES INFRATECH LIMITED 760000.0 Active 20/05/1996 - -
Associated with Directors
VINAMRA AGARWAL Director VISHNU AGARWAL Director TARKESHWAR NATH RAI Director VIBHU AGARWAL Director