SUSHIL KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SUSHIL KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24231WB1983PTC036999 LA CHEMICO PVT LTD 8461000.0 Active 27/09/1993 - U51909WB1985PTC039577 TIRUPATI METALS PVT LTD 12402300.0 Active 01/04/2013 - U51909WB2008PTC129369 VIPASA AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 1732200.0 Active 05/10/2011 - U52100WB2010PTC144102 COMMON DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/08/2012 - U52100WB2010PTC144103 ASSEMBLE DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
SUYASH AGARWAL Director DEEPAK CHOUDHURY Director USHA AGARWAL Director