SUNIL KUMAR DADHICH
-
About SUNIL KUMAR DADHICH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101WB1999PTC089515 TORSA FIBRES PRIVATE LIMITED 567800.0 Amalgamated 15/06/2007 - U51109WB1994PTC062479 HARSMUKHI VYAPAAR PVT LTD 1430200.0 Amalgamated 26/03/1994 - U51109WB1994PTC062483 GREENROSE COMMODITIES PVT LTD 941600.0 Active 24/03/1994 - U51109WB2007PTC115038 VENUS VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 395250.0 Amalgamated 05/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115042 ZENITH COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 808550.0 Amalgamated 05/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115073 RUDRAKASH SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 295500.0 Amalgamated 09/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115074 SINGHVAHINI COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 299500.0 Amalgamated 09/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115076 SKYLARK DEALER PRIVATE LIMITED 361400.0 Amalgamated 09/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115078 STARLIGHT VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Amalgamated 09/04/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC115080 UNIVERSAL VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 328500.0 Amalgamated 09/04/2007 - U51395WB1990PTC048664 UJJAWAL MERCANTILE PVT LTD 4492000.0 Amalgamated 28/03/1990 - U51909WB1995PTC072352 SUNDAR GOODS & SUPPLY PVT LTD 498300.0 Amalgamated 15/06/2006 - U67120WB1990PTC048689 JAYANT CREDIT PVT LTD 1690200.0 Amalgamated 09/05/1990 - U72900WB2000PTC091461 VIRTUAL COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 645710.0 Amalgamated 15/06/2006 - U74140WB1992PTC054900 V B CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 599580.0 Amalgamated 15/06/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
KANTA DADHICH Director JAGDISH PRASAD SHARMA Director SITA RAM SHARMA Director MINAKSHI JOSHI Director