SANDIP AGARWAL
-
About SANDIP AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24134WB1994PTC061649 VIDHARVA BAGS & SACKS PVT LTD 1200000.0 Active 08/07/1997 - U51109WB1982PTC035270 KAMDHENU COMMODITIES & TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/04/1995 - U51392WB1994PTC061669 GEOTECH SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 26/12/2000 - U51396WB1991PTC052946 AIE VALLEY TRADERS PVT LTD 7415120.0 Active 14/02/1998 - U51909WB1992PTC054287 KALPATARU AGRO FOREST ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 29/01/1992 - -
Associated with Directors
SAMIR AGARWAL Director NIRMALA AGARWAL Director MANISHA AGARWAL Director OMPRAKASH AGARWAL Director