SHEO CHARAN AGARWAL
-
About SHEO CHARAN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15142WB1955PTC022299 NAVA RASHTRA OIL MILLS PVT LTD 376000.0 Active 11/12/1993 - U22190WB1995PTC073774 SUPER COLORGRAFICS PVT. LTD. 10532100.0 Active 06/12/2012 - U45400WB2011PTC163618 VITALITY ABASAN PRIVATE LIMITED 985000.0 Active 29/09/2011 - U45400WB2011PTC169052 BASUKINATH PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 765000.0 Active 02/11/2011 - U65991WB1992PTC055340 SURYA JYOTI PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT PVT LTD 1700200.0 Active 04/05/1993 - U65999WB1993PTC058150 CHANAKYA SECURITIES PVT LTD 4295000.0 Active 18/03/1993 - U67120WB1995PTC072071 CHANAKYA STOCK BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LTD 10000000.0 Active 12/06/1995 - U74210WB1981PLC033256 COLOMBO COCONUT COMPLEX LTD 507000.0 Active 02/04/1990 - U91100WB2014NPL202531 CHITRALEKHA RESIDENT OWNERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 14/07/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
SHEO RATAN AGARWAL Director KASHI PRASAD BANKA Director ADHIR CHANDRA SAHA Director RAJIV TIBREWAL Director