SUNIL KUMAR MURARKA
-
About SUNIL KUMAR MURARKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15311BR1986PTC002476 SITA FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 7792100.0 Active 14/11/2007 - U15311BR2010PTC015829 STAR FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 15/04/2013 - U15311BR2010PTC016211 PANDOUL FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 53041780.0 Active 28/10/2010 - U51101WB1991PTC052802 MELINEX TRAEXIM PVT. LTD. 5306000.0 Active 19/09/2001 -