SARITA AGARWAL
-
About SARITA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400WB2003PTC096283 GARG AGROTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 923000.0 Active 29/05/2003 - U45201WB2000PLC092592 INDO PACIFIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED 547000.0 Active 22/01/2015 - U51109WB2000PTC092356 GARG MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 1472000.0 Active 01/11/2008 - U51909WB2004PTC098112 GARG EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 494500.0 Active 17/03/2004 - -
Associated with Directors
DINESH KUMAR AGARWAL Director JAGDISH PRASAD GARG Director