SUNIL DAGA
-
About SUNIL DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15544WB1987PTC043269 DAGA FOODS & DRINKS PVT LTD 483000.0 Active 01/12/1988 - U45201WB1993PTC059280 METROCITY PROMOTERS PVT. LTD. 450000.0 Active 20/02/2008 - U45202WB1988PTC045814 DAGA CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD. 498000.0 Active 23/12/1988 - U45209WB1998PTC087904 DAGAS RESIDENCE PRIVATE LIMITED 941000.0 Active 10/09/1998 - U51109WB1998PTC087672 H.L.FOUNDATON PRIVATE LIMITED 2167000.0 Active 20/11/2003 - -
Associated with Directors
SURESH KUMAR DAGA Director KRISHNA KUMAR DAGA Director