SATISH LAXMICHAND JAIN
-
About SATISH LAXMICHAND JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10101CT1991PTC006408 BUNDELKHAND SMOKELESS FUEL MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 781000.0 Active 12/10/2012 - U10200MH2009PTC194420 MAHAVIR COAL CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 99500000.0 Active 29/07/2009 - U45200MH2006PTC159253 HARRSHIV DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 01/09/2006 - U85320MH2017NPL302873 JAINACHARYA VIDYA SAGAR JI MAHARAJ EDUCATION FOUNDATION 1400000.0 Active 14/12/2017 - -
Associated with Directors