SHEILA RANI MITTAL
-
About SHEILA RANI MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24303UP2007PTC033066 FARUKHI GLASS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10100000.0 Active 27/03/2007 - U26102UP2002PTC026739 PARAS GLASS WARE PRIVATE LIMITED 19045000.0 Active 18/06/2009 - U26109DL1999PTC101152 AKASHDEEP GLASS INDUSTRIES PVT LTD 4012000.0 Active 16/08/1999 - U70101UP2005PTC030927 IKON HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 327400.0 Active 18/06/2009 - U74899DL1991PTC045350 F M GLASS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 23/12/1991 - -
Associated with Directors
SANJAY PRAKASH MITTAL Director SANJEEV PRAKASH MITTAL Director RAGINI MITTAL Director YOGESH GOYAL Director