SUNIL BHUTORIA
-
About SUNIL BHUTORIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10101WB2006PTC107909 GODAVARI COAL FIELDS PVT LTD 10099170.0 Active 14/02/2006 - U10102WB2006PTC110648 TRANS DAMODAR COAL MINING (P) LTD 16400000.0 Active 30/04/2011 - U23109WB1995PTC074047 TRIMURTI COAL SUPPLY PVT.LTD. 1953000.0 Active 28/09/2000 - U51905WB2006PTC108663 SURSADHNA COMMERCIAL PVT LTD 8127630.0 Active 23/03/2006 - U51909WB1994PTC066403 TRAMMEL MERCANTILES PVT LTD 2353000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 18/12/2006 - U51909WB2013PTC196047 OVERGROW MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U70102WB2013PTC193627 TOPSTAR DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2015 - U74999WB1994PTC066371 LAXY TRADING PVT. LTD. 15303000.0 Active 18/12/2006 - -
Associated with Directors