SHYAM SUNDER SHARMA
-
About SHYAM SUNDER SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01131CT1998PTC012992 NEERAJ CAMELLIA PRIVATE LIMITED 7322350.0 Active 10/08/1998 - U04520CT2004PTC017034 SUN AND SUN INFRAMETRIC PRIVATE LIMITED 8500000.0 Active 30/09/2006 - U11205CT1990PTC005911 SUN AND SUN COLD STORAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 01/06/2010 - U15331CT2013PTC000703 SUN AND SUN CATTLE FEED PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 15/01/2013 - U19119CT1992PTC000035 MINIMAX COMMERCE PVT. LTD. 16249000.0 Active 21/07/1999 - U24232CT1996PTC021782 CHHATTISGARH JEWELLERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5262000.0 Active 01/11/2010 - U45400WB2007PTC115533 MELODY INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 16/07/2007 - U45400WB2007PTC117293 SPLENDOR ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 30/07/2007 - U51109WB1995PTC068609 GANGOTRI TRACON PVT LTD 80640000.0 Active 02/04/2008 - U51109WB2005PTC101361 SURPRISE DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 3715000.0 Amalgamated 29/06/2007 - U52335WB2005PTC101184 GUNJAN SALES & SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 6330000.0 Amalgamated 29/06/2007 - -
Associated with Directors