SHAHANA RAHMAN
-
About SHAHANA RAHMAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01135KA2005PTC036449 A.S. HORTICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/2005 - U45201TN1991PTC021930 A.S.PROPERTIES & INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4540400.0 Active 30/09/2004 - U51109TN1993PTC025628 A.S. DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 900200.0 Active 24/03/2001 - U52599TN1992PTC022200 REACH LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 600200.0 Active 24/03/2001 - U55101TN2006PTC061449 REACH HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/11/2006 - U60231TN1992PTC022158 A.S.CARGO MOVERS PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 24/03/2001 - U60231TN1993PTC025583 A.S. CARRIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 833700.0 Active 24/03/2001 - U63013TN2009PTC070392 A.S.GLOBAL LOGISTICS & WAREHOUSING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/01/2009 - U63023TN2006PTC068848 PUNIT REACH LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/03/2007 - U74900TN2014PTC096228 A.S. LOGISTICS PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/06/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
AMAR RAHMAN Director KARTHIK AZHAGAPPAN Director VIKAASH KHDLOYA Director SIDDHARTHA GUPTA Director