SHIVA SHANKAR DAGA
-
About SHIVA SHANKAR DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132WB1955PTC022727 HALMIRA ESTATE TEA PVT LTD 10683100.0 Active 23/05/2000 - U01132WB1984PTC151081 THRIBHUVAN ASSOCIATES PVT LTD 1100000.0 Amalgamated 05/06/2002 - U01132WB1986PTC041068 DUKENHENGRA TEA PRIVATE LIMITED 8910150.0 Active 23/05/2000 - U01132WB2003PLC096437 SUPRIYA TEA LIMITED 1254360.0 Active 23/06/2006 - U20211AS1984PLC002204 DHANESWARI WOOD PRODUCTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U30008WB1997PLC085366 KOOL KIDZ PRODUCTS LIMITED 12546200.0 Active 15/03/2010 - U45203WB1945PTC012185 U P PAPER CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 2110500.0 Active 10/10/2003 - U51109WB1995PLC072793 NEWAR FINANCIAL LTD 4115500.0 Amalgamated 24/11/2006 - U51109WB1997PTC085624 PREDATOR EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 3072000.0 Amalgamated 01/12/2004 - U65999WB1997PTC084741 A N SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1722680.0 Active 23/02/2002 - U70101WB1993PTC059845 SILKY BUILDERS & FINCON PRIVATE LIMITED 3010440.0 Active 05/02/2002 - U74899DL1994PTC059906 NEWAR METALS PRIVATE LIMITED 9442000.0 Active 15/03/2010 - -
Associated with Directors