SHYAM SUNDER GOENKA
-
About SHYAM SUNDER GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25207DL2001PTC113045 SHUBH SHRINKWRAP PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 29/06/2005 - U27109DL1996PTC077527 MOPAZ ALLOYS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 25/03/1999 - U27109TG2003PTC041569 MMG STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 5515500.0 Active 22/08/2003 - U31103WB1965PLC026427 BCH ELECTRIC LIMITED 34577110.0 Active 06/09/2005 - -
Associated with Directors