SHYAM SUNDER SHARMA
-
About SHYAM SUNDER SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB2005PTC102270 SIDHIDHAN VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 3440000.0 Active 25/01/2010 - U51909WB2009PTC132975 PURPLE DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 117000.0 Active 23/02/2009 - U51909WB2010PTC148719 GYANDEEP MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 24/05/2010 - U51909WB2016PLC218074 DIVYAPANKH TRADING LIMITED 500000.0 Active 21/10/2016 - U70102WB2013PTC197511 DECORUM REALPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 9000000.0 Active 03/03/2014 - U80901WB2014PTC200880 JAGRAT EDUCATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/01/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SURENDRA KUMAR SETHIA Director AYUSH LATH Director RAM CHANDER SHARMA Director UTTAM MONDAL Director