SHREEKANT AGARWAL
-
About SHREEKANT AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L26922WB1974PLC029494 ANURADHA INVESTMENTS LTD 2400000.0 Active 09/08/1975 - L51226WB1981PLC033905 ROHINI TRADERS & EXPORTERS LTD 2000000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - L67120WB1975PLC030101 OLYMPIC GENERAL TRADING LIMITED. 2400000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - L67120WB1980PLC032574 SENILIS TRADING SYNDICATE LTD 3167500.0 Active 27/03/2015 - L67120WB1980PLC032790 GWALIOR SECURITIES & TRADERS LTD 3095000.0 Active 23/11/2016 - U52322WB1948PTC016525 HIND GENERAL TRADING CO PVT LTD 148500.0 Active 29/07/1990 - -
Associated with Directors