SMITA HARESH DESAI
-
About SMITA HARESH DESAI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U67190MH2007PTC170225 SUGUN CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/04/2007 - U74120MH2013PTC240466 SHAY CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 14/02/2013 - U93030MH2012PTC234719 CHIKHALI ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 21/08/2012 - U93030MH2012PTC234769 ATIMS CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 22/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
HARESH GUNVANTRAI DESAI Director