SHANKAR LAL KHANDELWAL
-
About SHANKAR LAL KHANDELWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L67120MH1995PLC086659 JOINDRE CAPITAL SERVICES LIMITED 138364600.0 Active 05/03/2004 - U15143RJ2008PTC026204 KAILASH SOLVEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/03/2015 - U27109RJ2011PTC035620 GUMAN STEELS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 23/06/2011 - U45201RJ2006PTC023403 KHANDELWAL BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 25575000.0 Active 01/12/2006 - U45201RJ2007PTC024215 BLUE MOON DREAMESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 16/08/2013 - U45201RJ2007PTC024320 SHRI GOVIND KRIPA BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 15600000.0 Active 30/04/2007 - U45201RJ2007PTC024482 SHRI GOVIND KRIPA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 1400000.0 Active 04/01/2016 - U45201RJ2011PTC037209 TIRUPATI BALAJI ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 19/12/2014 - U45201RJ2011PTC037210 SANWARIYAJI BUSINESS VENTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 28100000.0 Active 01/12/2011 - U45201RJ2011PTC037227 SHRINATHJI BUSINESS VENTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 27100000.0 Active 18/07/2012 - U45201RJ2012PTC037528 QUICKVIEW ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 05/01/2012 - U45201RJ2013PTC041592 GUMAN BUILDERS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 75000000.0 Active 23/02/2013 - U45208RJ1992PTC041235 ARPAN ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 05/09/2006 - U51393RJ2001PTC016964 GUMAN FURNITURE AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 40000000.0 Active 09/04/2001 - U70101RJ2011PTC035225 ROYAL STAR ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors