SUSHIL KUMAR BAJAJ
-
About SUSHIL KUMAR BAJAJ,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100BR2009PTC014469 BAJAJ IRON AND STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 6450000.0 Active 29/04/2009 - U27101JH1995PTC006744 JHARKHAND ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 982000.0 Active 10/02/2004 - U27106BR1995PLC006775 BALAJI ELECTROSTEELS LIMITED 76581500.0 Active 11/10/1995 - U45200BR2005PTC011502 KANIKA BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 6340000.0 Active 01/01/2008 - U45200BR2005PTC011534 RIA HOMES PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 12/08/2005 - U45200BR2008PTC013598 BAJAJ BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 9968150.0 Active 29/04/2008 - U51909BR2011PTC016872 BAJAJ COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/04/2011 - U55100BR2011PTC016841 BAJAJ REGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/04/2011 - U70102BR2010PTC015705 BAJAJ INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/2010 - U91200BR1947NPL000317 BIHAR INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 27/09/2014 - -
Associated with Directors