SANJAY KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL
-
About SANJAY KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122MH2010PTC199013 KHED SUGAR AND ALLIED PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 18/01/2010 - U15500MH2010PTC199331 KARJAT SUGAR MANUFACTURING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 25/01/2010 - U27100MH1994PTC076941 SHREE RAMDEOBABA STEELS P LTD 3004000.0 Active 04/03/1994 - U27108MH2004PTC119895 SDS FORGE PRIVATE LIMITED 203000.0 Active 25/09/2004 - U74999MH1956GAT010662 NAG VIDARBHA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE 0.0 Active 12/07/2015 - -
Associated with Directors