SURENDRA NATH OJHA
-
About SURENDRA NATH OJHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900WB2009PTC133659 QUANTUM DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 540000.0 Active 10/03/2009 - U51909WB1996PTC080172 SARVASAKTI MARKETING PVT LTD 2246000.0 Active 09/02/2015 - U51909WB2009PTC133635 PINACLE VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 540000.0 Active 09/03/2009 - U51909WB2010PTC148071 EFFECTIVE MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 460000.0 Active 17/05/2010 - U51909WB2010PTC148134 LITTLESTAR AGENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 540000.0 Active 17/05/2010 - U51909WB2010PTC149138 NAMOKAR COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 135000.0 Active 25/05/2010 - U51909WB2010PTC149144 SAVITRI VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 136000.0 Active 25/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
BISWAJIT SARKAR Director RUKMANI DEVI SHARMA Director GOVIND LAL Director