SANDEEP JAYANT SUKHTANKAR
-
About SANDEEP JAYANT SUKHTANKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U72200MH2005PTC156169 CALIBRE PERSONNEL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/09/2005 - U72900MH2015PTC263117 CERE LABS PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U72900MH2016PTC282330 SMARTIFY HEALTH PRIVATE LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 14/06/2016 - U74900MH2012PTC232830 ARHA CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/2012 - U74999MH2013PTC245394 NEOTEAM MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
JYOTI SANDEEP SUKHTANKAR Director DATTARAM BHASKAR RAJADHYAX Director TUSHAR RATILAL RATANGHAYRA Director