SHANAVAS KOTTIKOLLAN EDAVALATH
-
About SHANAVAS KOTTIKOLLAN EDAVALATH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27105KL1973PTC002512 JANATHA STEEL MILLS PVT LTD 775000.0 Active 29/09/2009 - U27106KL1993PTC007498 PEEKAY ROLLING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 29/09/2000 - U27310KL1991PTC006026 PEEKAY STEEL CASTINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 163885000.0 Active 30/09/1996 - U74999TZ2013PTC019896 PREMIUM MEDICAL AND HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2446716600.0 Active 27/09/2013 - U80900KL2008PTC022405 CLEARWATER EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT AND RESOURCES COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 9902500.0 Active 25/02/2011 - U91110KL1931NPL001527 THE MALABAR CHAMBER OF COMMERCE 0.0 Active 30/09/2016 - -
Associated with Directors