SARYU CHAUDHRY
-
About SARYU CHAUDHRY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2007PTC170224 FIRE CAPITAL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/03/2011 - U45200DL2007PTC170270 FIRE TOWNSHIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/03/2011 - U45204HR2009PTC039382 HELIX CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 3375000.0 Active 15/02/2012 - U45400DL2007PTC170273 FIRE CAPITAL TOWNSHIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/03/2011 - U64201DL2005PTC140001 IL INTELLAMBDA SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 37655100.0 Converted to LLP 16/06/2014 - U70200HR2010PTC040108 RCC E-CONSTRUCT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/02/2010 - U74140DL2004FTC125893 FIRE CAPITAL FUND PRIVATE LIMITED 205580.0 Active 15/09/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
OM CHAUDHRY Director RAHUL JAIN Director RANJANA CHAUDHRY Director