SURYA BHAN YADAV
-
About SURYA BHAN YADAV,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400UP2008PTC034490 ASSOTECH ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2008 - U55101UR2012PTC000085 BLOOMING RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/09/2015 - U70100DL2010PTC200681 SOLARIS INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/12/2015 - U70100DL2010PTC206260 ELEVEN INFRAHEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/05/2012 - U70100DL2011PTC216100 SOLARIS REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/04/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
ACHLA NAND Director CHANDER KISHORE SINGH Director SARYU PRASAD YADAV Director PARISH GUPTA Director