SUBBARAMAN ANAND VILAYANNUR
-
About SUBBARAMAN ANAND VILAYANNUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70102MH2012PTC228161 TATTVA & MITTAL LIFESPACES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U70109MH2016PTC281447 TATTVA AND MITTAL GROUP OF BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/05/2016 - U70200MH2011PTC217872 TATTVA & MITTAL REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/06/2014 - U70200MH2016PTC281366 TATTVA & MITTAL ESTATE BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/05/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMANAND PULAVARTI Director KISHORE GAURIDUTT MITTAL Director UMA SUBBARAMAN Director