SUNIL KAMALAKAR WARERKAR
-
About SUNIL KAMALAKAR WARERKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74999TG1965PLC001551 TCI INDUSTRIES LIMITED 67887110.0 Active 01/04/2012 - U40102KA2011PTC057675 BHORUKA COGEN POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2011 - U65191MH2010PTC260835 BHORUKA PARK INVESTMENTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 24/07/2014 - U65910MH2010PTC260840 PRABHU STRUCTURES INVESTMENT INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 24/07/2014 - U65993MH1995PTC261085 BHORUKA POWER HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 3943000.0 Amalgamated 10/09/2014 - U67120MH2008PTC260839 PRABHU STRUCTURES HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Amalgamated 24/07/2014 - U67120MH2008PTC261202 BHORUKA STEEL HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Amalgamated 24/07/2014 - U67190MH2008PTC261593 BHORUKA PARK HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Amalgamated 24/07/2014 - U70101MH2005PTC261648 BHORUKA POWER INVESTMENTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 25/07/2014 - U70101MH2008PTC261199 BHORUKA STEEL INVESTMENTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 24/07/2014 - U85110MH1995PTC261198 BHURUKA GASES HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 33407000.0 Amalgamated 24/07/2014 - U85110MH2005PTC261399 BHURUKA GASES INVESTMENTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 20100000.0 Active 24/07/2014 - -
Associated with Directors