SHIRISH MADHAV NAVLEKAR
-
About SHIRISH MADHAV NAVLEKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40102TG2014PTC093108 MYTRAH VAYU (GODAVARI) PRIVATE LIMITED 212560000.0 Active 21/02/2014 - U40104TG2015PTC098255 MYTRAH VAYU (SOM) PRIVATE LIMITED 303682400.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U40105TG2015PTC098250 MYTRAH VAYU (TUNGABHADRA) PRIVATE LIMITED 1606602000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U40106TG2013FLC089992 MYTRAH POWER (INDIA) LIMITED 500000.0 Active 12/09/2013 - U40108TG2012PTC081623 MYTRAH VAYU (BHIMA) PRIVATE LIMITED 156500000.0 Active 22/06/2012 - U40108TG2012PTC081624 MYTRAH VAYU (INDRAVATI) PRIVATE LIMITED 290800000.0 Active 01/07/2013 -