SAMPATKUMAR SHANKARLAL GILADA
-
About SAMPATKUMAR SHANKARLAL GILADA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65910KA1994PLC015981 GILADA FINANCE AND INVESTMENTS LIMITED 35123000.0 Active 08/06/1995 - U01403KA2012PTC064403 YASH PROTEINS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 15/06/2012 - U02692KA1984PTC006398 WHITEFIELD REFRACTORIES PRIVATE LIMITED 915000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - U26959KA1995PTC017233 GITA REFRACTORIES PRIVATE LIMITED 13500000.0 Active 04/03/2017 - U27100MH2010PTC201776 SAMRAT WIRES PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 06/04/2010 - U31101MH2001PTC131856 KRISHNA VALLEY POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 29950000.0 Active 15/03/2008 - U40100MH2003PTC138827 SAHYADRI RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 40019000.0 Active 15/03/2008 - U40101KA1997PTC021821 VIJAYALAKSHMI HYDRO POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 29918100.0 Active 15/05/2001 - U40101KA2004PTC033382 SRM POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 105666700.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U67120KA1999PTC025546 SHANKARLAL GILADA & SONS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 27/11/2000 - U70109KA1994PLC015481 SRI SHAKTI LAND DEVELOPERS AND CONSTRUCTIONS COMPANY LIMITED 3447200.0 Active 30/09/1997 - U85110KA1995PTC018188 RAJVAIBHAV ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/07/1995 - -
Associated with Directors