SHANKAR VARADHARAJAN
-
About SHANKAR VARADHARAJAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01134TN1994PLC026861 SIVA INDUSTRIES AND HOLDINGS LIMITED 1473666600.0 Active 30/01/2015 - U33209TN1996PLC035712 ETH LIMITED 81000000.0 Active 30/06/2015 - U40100TN2007PTC064332 WINWIND POWER ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 4483996630.0 Active 14/01/2015 - U40101TN1994PLC029268 SIVA ALTERNATIVE POWER AND ENERGY PROJECTS LIMITED 501000.0 Active 27/10/2014 - U45202MH2009PTC191760 JAIRO BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2016 - U64203HR2007PTC039536 S TEL PRIVATE LIMITED 2408235290.0 Under Liquidation 16/12/2014 - U67190TN1996PLC035451 ABHI AMBI FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 13740000.0 Active 14/11/2014 - U70101TN1997PTC038564 HI-TECH HOUSING PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 9960300.0 Active 05/09/2014 - U72300TN1995PLC030384 SIVA COMPULINK LIMITED 59860000.0 Active 22/04/2016 - U72300TN1999PLC042194 STERLING COMPUTERS LIMITED 500070.0 Active 05/02/2016 - U74140TN2010PLC074929 AIWO LIMITED 8218000.0 Active 30/12/2014 - U74999TN1993PLC024859 STERLING FUTURES AND HOLIDAYS LIMITED 23200000.0 Active 05/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors