SHILPA MODI
-
About SHILPA MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101MH1986PTC041867 RADHAKRISHNA MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 16990000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/2011 - U29100MH2016PTC288909 BYGGING TANKNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/12/2016 - U51900MH1994PTC077749 SOUMIL EXPORT PRIVATE LIMITED 4911000.0 Amalgamated 25/08/1997 - U52190WB2011PTC166225 ENDORSE MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 20/04/2017 - U52190WB2011PTC166365 DOYEN BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 22/04/2017 - U52190WB2011PTC166366 GRADE COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 10508645.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U65990MH1994PTC080412 SENSEX SECURITIES AND FINANZ PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 15/03/2016 - U65990MH1994PTC080413 STERLING HYDRAULICS PRIVATE LIMITED 2860000.0 Active 15/03/2016 - U67190MH2010PTC201931 BIHARIJI SHARE TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 5535000.0 Active 12/04/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
MAITHILI DIPAK MODI Director DIPAK RAVISHANKAR MODI Director GOPAL MODI RAVISHANKAR Director