SHAZ POKKAKKILLATH AYYOOB
-
About SHAZ POKKAKKILLATH AYYOOB,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01300KL2009PTC024978 BLUEMOON PLANTATIONS AND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/11/2009 - U01400KL2009PTC025066 SHERIN PLANTATIONS AND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/11/2009 - U14102KL2009PTC024935 SILVERLINE GRANITE CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/10/2009 - U14102KL2009PTC024964 BESTYIELD GRANITE CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/11/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
SHAJINA AYYOOB Director POKKAKKILLATH KUNJIBAVA AYYOOB Director SHERIN POKAKILLATH AYOOB Director