SANDEEP AHUJA
-
About SANDEEP AHUJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45206MH2013PTC247980 RICHA SPACE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U45400DL2009PTC192232 PRINCELY INFRAPROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2009 - U70102MH2014PTC258913 SMART HOME INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/10/2014 - U70102MH2014PTC258914 CREDENCE HOMETECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/10/2014 - U74999MH2017PTC301174 SD DIGITECH SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/10/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
ANIL BABURAO THOTE Director PRAKASH SHARAD JOSHI Director KAJAL AHUJA Director NARINDER BANSAL Director