SUNIL MADANLAL AGRAWAL
-
About SUNIL MADANLAL AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122MH2013PTC245372 SHRI RAMDEVJI AGRO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/07/2013 - U15122MH2013PTC247521 BHOLE SHANKAR INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/08/2013 - U17120MH2013PTC243230 RUDRAPRIYA FABRICS PRIVATE LIMITED 20100000.0 Active 16/01/2017 - U17120MH2013PTC245373 SHRIRANG TEXTURES & YARNS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/07/2013 - U17299MH2013PTC241785 SIDDHIVINAYAKA TEXTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/04/2013 - U45202MH2011PTC212244 BIJASANIMATA INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/01/2011 - U45400MH2012PTC234873 VARAPRADA INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/08/2012 - U51101MH2013PTC246217 MADANMOHAN MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/07/2013 - U51909MH2013PTC245325 ARYA MEGATRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/07/2013 - U51909PN2013PTC147589 ARYA MULTITRADES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/05/2013 - -
Associated with Directors