SASHI DEVENDRA DAGA
-
About SASHI DEVENDRA DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70102MH2015PLC261585 GRATITUDE PROPERTIES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 03/02/2015 - U74120MH2012PTC234752 DAWN HEALTHCARE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/2014 - U74999MH2015PLC261500 GRATITUDE POLYESTER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/01/2015 - U74999MH2017PTC297718 BRIGHT TOWN INVESTMENT ADVISOR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/07/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC300845 PELLICONI INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/10/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC302811 PIXIES PROPERTIES AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/12/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC302860 SNITCH PROPERTIES AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/12/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC302943 SPERO PROPERTIES AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/12/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
DEVENDRA GOPIKISHAN DAGA Director SANTOSH SUDHAKAR ACHARYA Director