SANJAY RAMESHCHANDRA VYAS
-
About SANJAY RAMESHCHANDRA VYAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101MH2004PLC144653 COTTSTOWN FASHIONS LIMITED 95414040.0 Active 07/11/2013 - U55100GJ2009PLC056191 SHREEM SPA & RESORTS LIMITED 489723450.0 Active 01/09/2015 - U70102MH2012PTC235581 DELPHOENIX REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/09/2012 - U70102MH2014PTC251971 STAR9 REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/01/2014 - U74900MH2014PTC256420 AMV ENVIRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/07/2016 - U74999MH2016PTC285902 OMNIPOTENT INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 14/01/2017 - U92100MH2007PTC174044 SNIP ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 147000.0 Active 25/11/2013 - U92120MH2009PTC196581 SPHERE ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 147000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors