SUNIL INDRAVADAN SHAH
-
About SUNIL INDRAVADAN SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28920MH1961PTC011989 LOOP ENGINEERING CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U45400MH2007PTC171253 SAMVRUDHI MULTITRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 18451630.0 Active 14/04/2010 - U51109MH2009PTC189310 NANDINI MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 444000.0 Active 25/08/2010 - U51109MH2010PTC200649 SAPNA MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 701000.0 Active 10/03/2010 - U52100MH2014PTC257292 SAMVRUDHI TRADESOL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/08/2014 - U70100MH2013PTC239372 SAMVRUDHI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/01/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
NAWAL KISHOR RAMNARAYAN JOSHI Director RAJKUMAR KHATOD Director