SUBHASH CHANDER
-
About SUBHASH CHANDER,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70100CT2010PTC021983 AADRASH INFRAVENTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/11/2011 - U70102HR2016PTC058633 SHAMA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 21/03/2016 - U80100DL2016NPL301022 ECO TEACH FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 22/02/2017 - U80903DL2016NPL291325 NISHCHAL FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 17/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SOMVIR SINDHU Director MAHENDER SINGH Director RAJBIR SINGH Director RACHNA SHEORAN Director